Cowan, Kyle Northcote (CPSO#: 81005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paed General Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2675
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Cowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cowan ( CPSO# 81005 )

Business Address:
Children Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paed General Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE NORTHCOTE COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009