Cowan, William Dean (CPSO#: 31879)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 20, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Cowan was subject to an investigation by the College on allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. While the investigation was ongoing, Dr. Cowan resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.