Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cowell, John Walter Frederick (CPSO#: 23553)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998