Cowing, Barbara Lee (CPSO#: 86333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
STAR Family Health Team
80 Maria Street
Tavistock ON  N0B 2R0
Phone: (519) 655-2322
Fax: (519) 655-3073
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA LEE COWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009