Cox, Ashley Rebecca (CPSO#: 96404)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013