Cox, Gemma Louise (CPSO#: 107229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 29 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Ave, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEMMA LOUISE COX shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. COX is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. COX shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. COX is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. COX shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. COX is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. COX no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2017