Cox, Heather Lynette (CPSO#: 88634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 202
270 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 743-6760
Fax: (705) 743-9912
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather L. Cox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cox ( CPSO# 88634 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
270 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 743-6760

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 17 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNETTE COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016