Cox, Jafna Layth (CPSO#: 59783)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1996