Cox, John Osborne (CPSO#: 23881)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. O. Cox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 2055 Huron Church Road Windsor, ON N9C 2L4
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015