Cox, Patrick Gerard (CPSO#: 56056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35003
Fax: (905) 521-6183
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Gerard Cox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Dr. P. Cox ( CPSO# 56056 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite T-2123
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PATRICK GERARD COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986