Cox, Peter Norman (CPSO#: 58747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Critical Care
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6484
Fax: (416) 813-5313
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER NORMAN COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991