Coxon, Marcus Howard (CPSO#: 60656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gifford Hospital
3 Maple Street
Randolph VT  05060
United States
Phone: (802) 728-2445

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS HOWARD COXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COXON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1999