Crabtree, Marilyn Janet (CPSO#: 59645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 100
34 Ottawa Street
PO Box 772
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: 613-543-4171
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marilyn Crabtree Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crabtree ( CPSO# 59645 )

Business Address:
St Lawrence Medical Clinic
34 Ottawa Street
Suite 100
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone Number: (613) 543-2963

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN JANET CRABTREE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRABTREE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989