Crabtree, Paul Omer Embree (CPSO#: 66954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Fax: (613) 230-7778
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crabtree Faught Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Crabtree ( CPSO# 66954 )
Dr. C. Faught ( CPSO# 65440 )

Business Address:
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone Number: (613) 230-7788

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room 7232 P O Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL OMER EMBREE CRABTREE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRABTREE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995