Craen, Rosemary Ann Patricia (CPSO#: 64449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Anesthesia and Periop Med
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
P O Box 5339 Station CSC
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 13763
Fax: (519) 663-2957
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMARY ANN PATRICIA CRAEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999