Cragg, Frank John (CPSO#: 55288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1989