Cragg, Paul Cecil (CPSO#: 24050)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Cragg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014