Craig, Anne Louise (CPSO#: 83056)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Auckland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2005 to 18 Jul 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 2006