Craig, Ian David (CPSO#: 27802)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011