Craigen, Gerard Patrick (CPSO#: 52896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone: (416) 972-1931
Fax: (416) 972-7690
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD PATRICK CRAIGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAIGEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 15 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1986