Crainford, Steven (CPSO#: 25071)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1998

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Feb 1998
Summary:

On February 20, 1998, Dr. Crainford pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in 
that he engaged in sexual impropriety with patients as well as that he failed to maintain the 
standard of practice of the profession in accordance with the Committee s to Order by way of the 
consent, filed, of the parties.  The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Crainford s guilty plea and 
found him guilty of professional misconduct. 
 
1.    The Discipline Committee finds Dr. Steven Crainford guilty of professional misconduct, in that he 
      engaged in sexual impropriety with patients and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
      profession in accordance with the agreed statement of facts filed by the parties with the 
      Committee. 
 
2.    The Discipline Committee dismisses the allegation of incompetence. 
 
3.    The Discipline Committee orders the reprimand of Dr. Steven Crainford. 
 
4.    The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Crainford to cease practising medicine by midnight of June 
      20, 1998 and to tender his resignation to be effective on that date. 
 
5.    The Discipline Committee accepts the resignation of Dr. Steven Crainford. 
 
6.    The Discipline Committee acknowledges Dr. Crainford has undertaken not to apply for 
      registration until one year after the effective date of his resignation. 
 
7.    The Discipline Committee acknowledges that if and when the Registration Committee accepts Dr. 
      Crainford's application for re-entry into practice, Dr. Crainford has agreed to practise under the 
      following conditions: 
 
      (a) Dr. Crainford will continue therapy with Dr. Wood Hill who will report to the Registrar of 
         the College on a quarterly basis for 12 months following Dr. Crainford's re-entry into 
         practice; 
 
      (b) Dr. Crainford will meet once a month with a practice consultant acceptable to the Registrar 
         who will report to the Registrar on a quarterly basis for 12 months following Dr. Crainford's 
         re-entry into practice; and 
 
      (c) Dr. Crainford will practise in an environment acceptable to the Registrar for a one-year 
         period following re-entry into practice. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 20, 1998