Cram, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 68099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Gervais Drive
Suite 309
Toronto ON  M3C 1Y9
Phone: (416) 385-3431
Fax: (416) 385-1945
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Cram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cram ( CPSO# 68099 )

Business Address:
29 Gervais Drive
Suite 309
Toronto ON  M3C 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 385-3431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE CRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999