Cramer, Christine Roberta (CPSO#: 70565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wingham & District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3210
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Cramer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cramer ( CPSO# 70565 )

Business Address:
Hyde Park Medical & Walk-in Clinic
640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1

Business Address:
Wingham & District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ROBERTA CRAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 1996 to 19 Jul 1996
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997