Crampton, Susan Yvonne (CPSO#: 82664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 722-0516
Fax: (705) 722-0814
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Crampton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Crampton ( CPSO# 82664 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 722-0516

Business Address:
370 Bayview Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4N 8Y2
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN YVONNE CRAMPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAMPTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007