Crane, Joan Millicent Georgina (CPSO#: 68724)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2006