Cranney, Blanid Ann (CPSO#: 55905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective Assoc
875 Carling Ave.
PO Box 8225
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (800) 267-6522
Fax: (877) 763-1300
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 19 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLANID ANN CRANNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANNEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 7 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986