Cranstoun, Kelly Rae (CPSO#: 62135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6183
Fax: (416) 756-6066
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4002 Sheppard Ave E Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1S 4R5
Canada
Phone: (416) 299-9895
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10 Angeline Street North 3rd Floor
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: 705-328-6171
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

1333 Sheppard Avenue East Suite 125
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416-494-0030
Fax: 416-494-8611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cranstoun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cranstoun ( CPSO# 62135 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6183

Business Address:
North York General Hospital - Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
Parkway Nuclear Services
10 Angeline Street North
2nd Floor
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6171

Business Address:
35 Playter Crescent
Toronto ON  M4K 1S4
Phone Number: (416) 463-2244

Business Address:
Kennedy & Sheppard Diagnostic Clinic
304 - 4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 1S6
Phone Number: (416) 299-9895

Business Address:
York X-Ray Management Ltd
125 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 494-0030

Business Address:
York X-Ray Management Ltd.
York Radiology & Ultrasound Consultants
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 100/102
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1

Business Address:
York X-Ray Management Ltd.
York Radiology & Ultrasound Consultants
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1

Business Address:
York X-Ray Management Ltd.
3292 Bayview Avenue
Suites 206-207
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5

Business Address:
York X- Ray Management Ltd.
1450 O' Connor Drive East
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 759-6964

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY RAE CRANSTOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANSTOUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991