Craven, Beverley Catharine (CPSO#: 68244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Room 206-J
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6122
Fax: (416) 422-5402
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLEY CATHARINE CRAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAVEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998