Craven, Kenneth Douglas (CPSO#: 56032)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 155 North Town Line East Ingersoll ON N5C 3J5
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015