Crawford, Mark Wynter (CPSO#: 57330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark W. Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crawford ( CPSO# 57330 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Room 2212
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK WYNTER CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991