Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Crawford, Thomas Russell (CPSO#: 69606)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1996