Crawford, William Francis (CPSO#: 59363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Island Medical Clinic
1186 Richard Street
Richards Landing ON  P0R 1J0
Phone: (705) 246-2477
Fax: (705) 246-0487
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

278 Front Street
Hornepayne ON  P0M 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (807) 868-2442 Ext. 230
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Crawford ( CPSO# 59363 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph Island Medical Clinic
1186 Richard Street
Richards Landing ON  P0R 1J0
Phone Number: (705) 246-2477

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1997