Crawford-Bourke, Denise (CPSO#: 73097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Crawford, Denise (used until: 12 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4912
Fax: (905) 721-3558
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denise Crawford-Bourke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Crawford-Bourke ( CPSO# 73097 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4912

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE CRAWFORD-BOURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD-BOURKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 1998 to 30 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000