Cressey, Christopher Frederick (CPSO#: 57480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
450 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone: (519) 343-3831
Fax: (519) 343-9944
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

R R #1
Wroxeter ON  N0G 2X0
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Cressey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cressey ( CPSO# 57480 )

Business Address:
43924 Salem Road
RR1
Wroxeter ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 292-6676

Business Address:
300 - 450 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 343-3831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 29, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher Frederick
            Cressey, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cressey to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. CHRISTOPHER FREDERICK CRESSEY
                                          ("Dr. Cressey")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Cressey, certificate of registration number 57480, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my medical
                  record-keeping arising from a reassessment of my practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action at this time in respect of the reassessment.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts once every
                              month for a period of at least six (6) months;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month for a period of at least six
                              (6) months;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  If, after six (6) months, the Clinical Supervisor is of the
                              opinion that I have made sufficient improvement in my medical
                              record-keeping to practice in a less highly supervised
                              environment, and subject to approval from the College, for
                              the remaining six (6) months of the supervision the Clinical
                              Supervisor may:
                  
                              1.    Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts once
                                    every quarter; and
                              2.    Meet with me once every quarter;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        assessor dated November 29, 2015, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Cressey, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Cressey, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the Clinical Supervision set out above; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cressey, understand that the Reassessment will focus on
                        charts from the six (6) month period immediately following the
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cressey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Cressey, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (13)  Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Cressey, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Cressey was the subject of an assessment of his record-keeping
                        arising from an investigation of his practice.  As a result of the
                        assessment:
                  
                        *      Dr. Cressey will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Cressey's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Cressey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Cressey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Cressey, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Frederick Cressey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective March 29, 2016:

Dr. Cressey was the subject of an assessment of his record-keeping arising from an investigation of his practice. As a result of the assessment:

- Dr. Cressey will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

- Dr. Cressey's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.