Cresswell, David Andrew (CPSO#: 59749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 408
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 570-1492
Fax: (519) 570-3387
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cresswell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cresswell ( CPSO# 59749 )

Business Address:
408 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 570-1492

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW CRESSWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRESSWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989