Crichton, Andrew Charles Sprunt (CPSO#: 50022)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2000