Crilly, Richard George (CPSO#: 42503)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Crilly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 2017