Cripps, Stephanie Marie (CPSO#: 70640)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 28 Feb 1997
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1997