Crisp, David Thomas (CPSO#: 50303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Oshawa Clinic (Neuro)
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5414
Fax: (905) 721-3585
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David T. Crisp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Crisp ( CPSO# 50303 )

Business Address:
The Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID THOMAS CRISP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984