Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Critchley, Patrick Philip (CPSO#: 59364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone: (705) 267-5511
Fax: (705) 264-6373
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Misiway Community Health Centre
130 Wilson Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 2S9
Canada
Phone: (705) 264-2200
Fax: (705) 267-5688
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Critchley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Critchley ( CPSO# 59364 )

Business Address:
3 - 227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone Number: (705) 267-5511

Business Address:
Misiway Health Clinic
130 Wilson Street
Timmins ON  P4N 2S9
Phone Number: (705) 264-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK PHILIP CRITCHLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRITCHLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1990