Crockett, Maryanne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 69822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Robb, Maryanne Elizabeth (used until: 07 Mar 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 28 Apr 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Research Fellows - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007