Croft, Stephen William Benjamin (CPSO#: 99443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine
Clinic
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM BENJAMIN CROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROFT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2012 to 26 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2017