Crombie, Carrie Anne (CPSO#: 68886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
225 John St South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2C7
Phone: 905-529-9779
Fax: 905-972-0400
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARRIE ANNE CROMBIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROMBIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jan 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998