Cromey, Michael Granville (CPSO#: 29481)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2004