Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cronk, Lawson Bruce (CPSO#: 12063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Mar 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994