Crook, Juanita Mary (CPSO#: 31319)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Heffernan, Juanita Mary (used until: 26 Nov 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009