Crookston, David George (CPSO#: 50305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3604
Fax: (705) 759-3651
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6629
Fax: 416-530-6243
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 2974
Fax: 905-853-2217
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-1234 Ext. 5601
Fax: (705) 759-7487
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crookston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Crookston ( CPSO# 50305 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5601

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6629

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE CROOKSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROOKSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985