Croome, Alison Jane Greer (CPSO#: 87793)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 07 Apr 2008 to 02 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2010