Crosby, David Ross Gordon (CPSO#: 22330)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2007