Crosby, Edward Thomas (CPSO#: 54204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Anesthesiology
Suite 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Crosby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Crosby ( CPSO# 54204 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
CCW1401 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD THOMAS CROSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1985